+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Pugh.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Flanagan.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Kresha and Albright.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Bly.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Slocum.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Lee and Thissen.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor