+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3020
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3020
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Returned by Chair to Government Operations
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Local Government
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor