+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date upon constitutional amendment adoption proposed under Laws 2013, chapter 124
- Secretary of State Chapter 282
- Governor's action Approval
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Presentment date
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate (vote: 68-62)
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Motion prevailed (vote: 68-60)
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
- Third reading Passed as amended (vote: 40-25)
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2575
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2575, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 69-63)
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 8, 2014
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor