+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date Sec. 1 05/25/13; Sec. 2
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
- Secretary of State Chapter 140
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Presentment date
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate (vote: 132-2)
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On May 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from table
- Third reading Passed (vote: 64-0)
- Special Order: Amended
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Taken from table
- Laid on table
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 110-23)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 8, 2013
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to pass
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance