+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date Local Approval
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 210 05/09/14
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Presentment date
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 62-0)
- Special Order
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2565
- Second reading
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2565, now on General Orders
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 123-0)
- Third reading
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 25, 2014
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections