+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3322
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3322
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Joint rule 2.03 waived
- Committee report, to adopt
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Kunesh-Podein
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy