+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 07/01/16
On May 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 139 05/22/16
- Governor's action Approval 05/22/16
On May 22, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter number 139
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/22/2016
- Governor approval 05/22/16
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/19/16
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/19/16
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3034
- Second reading
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3034, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 18, 2016
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor