+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Isaacson
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Persell
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Dorholt
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Slocum
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor