+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Bierman and O'Driscoll
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Wolgamott, Edelson, Huot, and Cantrell
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Winkler, Poston, Bennett, Backer, and Hamilton
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Elkins
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Halverson
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor