+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3125
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3125
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Authors added Gruenhagen and Winkler
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Authors added Her, Dettmer, Youakim, Kunesh-Podein, and Heinrich
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Cantrell
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor