+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF 2733
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF 2733
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce and Regulatory Reform
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance