+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Fenton.
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Knoblach.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor