+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF3251
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Property and Local Tax Division
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Kunesh-Podein
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Bahr
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Koegel
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Kiel
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy Division