+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Secretary of State Chapter 271
- Governor's action Approval
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed (vote: 58-0)
- Presentment date
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- House adopted HCC report and repassed bill
- Third reading (vote: 58-0)
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
- Conference committee report, delete everything
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to adopt conference committee report
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference (vote: 114-15)
- House adopted conference committee report (vote: 114-12)
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Senate conferees Sparks, Bonoff, Dahms
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with amendment
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
- House conferees Mahoney; Persell; Gunther
- Senate conferees Sparks; Bonoff; Dahms
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House conferees Mahoney, Persell, Gunther
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed (vote: 64-0)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2617
- Second reading
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2617, now on General Orders
- Received from House
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 130-0)
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 7, 2014
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor