+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Moran and Kahn.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Yarusso and Selcer.
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, S.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Bernardy, Persell, Ward, Fischer, and Schultz.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Norton and Bly.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy