+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Haley.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Franke.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Davids.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Theis.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance