+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Kiel.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Davids.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Poppe.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Backer.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Swedzinski and Johnson, C.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor