+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF 2525
- Author added Mariani.
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Schoen.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, C.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Bly.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor