+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF802
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF802
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor