+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 21, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Schoen.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Murphy, E.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Laine.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Slocum.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance