+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1762
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Jobs and Economic Development Finance and Policy
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance and Policy