+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Selcer
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy