+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Pryor
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Moran
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Reyer
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Boldon and Thompson
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Howard, Greenman, Elkins, Long, Pinto
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor