+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Amended
- Taken from table
- Laid on table
- Special Order: Amended
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2467
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduction and first reading
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2467
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 73-55)
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 1, 2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor