+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Hornstein.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Clark.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler.
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy