+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2718
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 28, 2014
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor