+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 152 04/02/14
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Presentment date
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 54-0)
- Special Order
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2311
- Second reading
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn and re-referred to Rules and Administration
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to State and Local Government
- Introduction and first reading
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 129-0)
- Third reading
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 13, 2014
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Veterans Affairs