+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF 2869
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF 2869
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Vogel.
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform