+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Freiberg
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Christensen
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Author added Hornstein
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Authors added Hausman, Becker-Finn, Noor, Feist, Hollins and Davnie
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor