+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF 2542
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF 2542
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Schoen.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Policy and Finance
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division