+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Erickson, S.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Gruenhagen
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Urdahl
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Jobs and Economic Development Finance and Policy
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Loeffler and Bly
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Ward, J.E.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Workplace and Regulated Industries
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor