+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to State and Local Government
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 11, 2016
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 09, 2016
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Runbeck.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Author stricken Thissen.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Hertaus.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Authors added Lillie, Thissen, and Heintzeman.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Author added Nelson.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy