+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 172 04/29/14
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Presentment date
- Returned from Senate
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- Third reading Passed (vote: 48-16)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2053
- Second reading
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed (vote: 110-16)
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Introduction and first reading
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2053, now on General Orders
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, C.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 10, 2014
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Marquart
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Davids
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Laine
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Dorholt
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor