+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date Various Dates
- Governor's action Approval
- Secretary of State Chapter 275
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Presentment date
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 62-0)
- Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1997
- Second reading
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1997, now on General Orders
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 122-0)
- Third reading
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 9, 2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor