+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
- Recalled by Chair Ways and Means
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Recalled by Chair Ways and Means
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor