+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Bennett.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Sauke and Knoblach.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Thissen.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Schultz and Kiel.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Omar.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Pierson and Pinto.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Mariani.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor