+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Hilstrom
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Hornstein and Johnson, S.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Newton and Bernardy
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Lillie
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy