+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Authors added Clark and Kahn
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Mullery
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Newton
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Slocum
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Jobs and Economic Development Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor