+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Jessup
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Authors added Franke and Jurgens.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Neu.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Smith.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Gunther.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Grossell.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Bahr, C.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Runbeck.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Baker.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Bennett.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Poppe; Anderson, S.; and Hoppe.
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Nornes.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Green, Lillie, Albright, Franson, and McDonald.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Kresha, Howe, Daniels, Swedzinski, and Lueck.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Nash.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Drazkowski, Knoblach, and Marquart.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Lien.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Lucero.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor