+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter number 12
- Secretary of State, Filed 04/26/2021
- Governor approval 04/26/2021
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date Various Dates
- pg. 4084
- Governor's action Approval 04/26/2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 04/23/2021
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 04/23/2021
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 3032 vote: 66-0
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Special Order
- pg. 3031
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 1313
- pg. 1313
- Laid on table
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 1183
- pg. 1183
- pg. 1182
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
- Second reading
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to suspend rules
- Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor