+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Omar.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Johnson, S.; Hornstein; and Lillie.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Jessup.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Moran.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Maye Quade.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Koegel, Franson, and McDonald.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Youakim, Dettmer, and Dehn, R.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Rosenthal.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Authors added Lee, Clark, and Slocum.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor