+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 1, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Secretary of State Chapter 274
- Governor's action Approval
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Presentment date
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- House concurred and repassed bill
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate (vote: 75-52)
- Third reading as amended by the Senate
- Motion prevailed (vote: 71-56)
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 40-19)
- Special Order: Amended
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2472
- Second reading
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2472, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 132-0)
- Third reading
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 24, 2014
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor