+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- See also SF5, Art. 1, Sec. 5 and 7 (First Special Session)
- Secretary of State Chapter 12 05/01/15
On May 2, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 05/02/2015
On May 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date Sec. 1 05/02/15; Sec. 2 07/01/15
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter number 12
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/01/15
- Presentment date 05/01/15
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/01/15
- Governor approval 05/01/15
- Presented to Governor 05/01/15
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
- Third reading
- House adopted HCC report and repassed bill
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- House adopted conference committee report
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Joint rule 2.06 - twelve hour rule suspended
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Senate conferees Dahle, Skoe, Dahms
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Dahle; Skoe; Dahms
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- House conferees Bly; Hamilton; Miller
- House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House conferees Bly, Hamilton, Miller
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Motion prevailed vote: 73-58
- Motion to refuse to concur
- Motion to concur with Senate amendments
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Finance
- Introduction and first reading
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
- Second reading
- Rules suspended, urgency declared
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to suspend rules
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance