+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF2226
- Authors added Hausman, Howard, and Fischer
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2226
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Agriculture and Food Finance and Policy Division
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means