+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Author added Sauke.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Author stricken Knoblach.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Knoblach.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Hamilton.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Clark.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform