+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF2184
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2184
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to Health and Human Services Policy
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy