+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Author added Runbeck
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Poston
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Policy
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Haley
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division