+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- See First Special Session 2019, HF5
- Bill laid on table in House
- Joint rule 3.02, conference committee discharged
- Senate conferees Chamberlain; Senjem; Dahms; Howe; Rest
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Joint rule 3.02(a), conference committee discharged, bill laid on table
- Senate conferees Chamberlain, Senjem, Dahms, Howe, Rest.
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees Marquart, Loeffler, Lislegard, Gomez, Davids
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed
- House conferees Marquart; Loeffler; Lislegard; Gomez; Davids
- House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- Returned from Senate with amendment
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF5
- Second reading
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF5, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 25, 2019
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Loeffler
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Youakim
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes