+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Second reading
- Taken from table
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Introduction and first reading
- Received from House
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 09, 2016
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy and Finance
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor