+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Author added Schoen
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1892
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor